THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:02:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Philippines, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FILIPINO, TAGALOG

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 17 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Records Management LTD
13-1 Hign Meadow Place
Toronto, Ontario
M9L 0A3
Date Received: 11 May 2020

Instructions/Address:
Record Management Ltd.
13 - 1 High Meadow Pl
Toronto ON M9L 0A3

Tel: 1-800-775-0093
www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 12 Mar 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cosico De Jesus Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FILIPINO, TAGALOG
Medical School: University of the Philippines, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 17 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Records Management LTD
13-1 Hign Meadow Place
Toronto, Ontario
M9L 0A3
Date Received: 11 May 2020

Instructions/Address:
Record Management Ltd.
13 - 1 High Meadow Pl
Toronto ON M9L 0A3

Tel: 1-800-775-0093
www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 12 Mar 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cosico De Jesus Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Philippines, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020


DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Oct 1987

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1982