THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:39:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Republic, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 24 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: University of the Republic, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 24 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Republic, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1980
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Nov 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 1980