THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 03:44:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Stronach Regional Cancer Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Extension: 6595
Fax: (905) 952-2818
Address: 610 University Avenue
Toronto, Ontario
M5G 2M9
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2320
Fax: (416) 946-4586

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 17 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Stronach Regional Cancer Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Extension: 6595
Fax: (905) 952-2818
Address: 610 University Avenue
Toronto, Ontario
M5G 2M9
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2320
Fax: (416) 946-4586

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 17 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WOODROW ALFRED WELLS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WELLS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WOODROW ALFRED WELLS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WELLS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jan 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1977