THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:30:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On October 9, 2014, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Newmarket, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Murray D Weingarten in respect of an incident that took place in March 2009. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On October 9, 2014, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Newmarket, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Murray D Weingarten in respect of an incident that took place in March 2009. 

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 07 Apr 2025
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 2025

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jun 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1979