THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 02:47:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saigon, 1967
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, VIETNAMESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Records & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St Regis Crescent S.
North York, ON M3J 1Y6

www.GetMyMedRecord.ca

Phone: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 17 May 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, VIETNAMESE
Medical School: University of Saigon, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Records & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St Regis Crescent S.
North York, ON M3J 1Y6

www.GetMyMedRecord.ca

Phone: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 17 May 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saigon, 1967

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 11 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 2018


DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 1983

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1981