THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:49:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1978
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Court Health Centenary Centre
2863 Ellesmere Road
Suite 413
Scarborough Ontario M1E 5E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 283-5871
Fax: (416) 283-5875
Address: The Cumberland Clinic
Renaissance Court
Suite 225
162 Cumberland Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 2X9
Phone: (416) 283-5871
Fax: (416) 283-5875

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 26 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marietta Zorn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Aug 2024

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Zorn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Jul 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Court Health Centenary Centre
2863 Ellesmere Road
Suite 413
Scarborough Ontario M1E 5E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 283-5871
Fax: (416) 283-5875
Address: The Cumberland Clinic
Renaissance Court
Suite 225
162 Cumberland Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 2X9
Phone: (416) 283-5871
Fax: (416) 283-5875

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 26 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marietta Zorn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Aug 2024

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Zorn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Jul 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIETTA LOUISE THERESA ZORN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZORN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIETTA LOUISE THERESA ZORN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZORN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Jun 1979
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Apr 1984

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1980

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1979

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1978