THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:16:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Delhi, 1978
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 136
100 Pertosa Drive
Brampton Ontario L6X 0H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 451-1244
Extension: 101
Fax: (905) 451-6955

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of Delhi, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 136
100 Pertosa Drive
Brampton Ontario L6X 0H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 451-1244
Extension: 101
Fax: (905) 451-6955

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANUPAM MALIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALIK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANUPAM MALIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALIK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Delhi, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1990
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 14 Sep 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 1990

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 1990

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 1984

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1981