THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:39:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 02 Dec 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 02 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Kingston Health Sciences Centre, 76 Stuart Street, Kingston, Ontario K7L 2V7
Date Received: 21 Jul 2021

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Christopher Wallace Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Sep 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 02 Dec 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 02 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Kingston Health Sciences Centre, 76 Stuart Street, Kingston, Ontario K7L 2V7
Date Received: 21 Jul 2021

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Christopher Wallace Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Sep 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 23 Jul 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1980