THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:37:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 24 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. R. Walker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Nov 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 24 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. R. Walker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Nov 2022

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jun 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Mar 1988

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1982