THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:37:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Shantung Medical College, 1962
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, CHINESE, MANDARIN, SWATOW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking to access their medical record can contact: 123 Edward Street, Diagnostic Imaging: 416-597-1016
Date Received: 19 Jun 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, CHINESE, MANDARIN, SWATOW
Medical School: Shantung Medical College, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking to access their medical record can contact: 123 Edward Street, Diagnostic Imaging: 416-597-1016
Date Received: 19 Jun 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Shantung Medical College, 1962

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Jan 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Apr 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1978
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 1985

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Jan 1985

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 1984

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1978