THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:34:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Guru Nanak Dev University, 1974
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Mand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Mar 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Guru Nanak Dev University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Mand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Mar 2022

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 18 Nov 2021
Summary:
Following an assessment that identified issues with Dr. Mand’s knowledge, skill and judgement in his family practice, he underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of his practice. The reassessment report subsequently received by the College continued to raise concerns about his knowledge, skill and judgement in his family practice. Dr. Mand accordingly underwent further remediation and submitted to a further reassessment. The further reassessment report has continued to raise concerns about Dr. Mand’s standard of practice in family medicine. In the face of this further reassessment, Dr. Mand has resigned from the College effective December 31, 2021 and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. 


Source: Member
Effective Date: 29 Oct 2018
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Gurpal Singh Mand to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 29, 2018:

College investigations were conducted into whether Dr. Mand engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his emergency medicine practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Mand will not engage in the practice of Emergency Medicine and will not practice in any Urgent Care Clinic.

Dr. Mand will engage in professional education in communications. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 18 Nov 2021
Summary:
Following an assessment that identified issues with Dr. Mand’s knowledge, skill and judgement in his family practice, he underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of his practice. The reassessment report subsequently received by the College continued to raise concerns about his knowledge, skill and judgement in his family practice. Dr. Mand accordingly underwent further remediation and submitted to a further reassessment. The further reassessment report has continued to raise concerns about Dr. Mand’s standard of practice in family medicine. In the face of this further reassessment, Dr. Mand has resigned from the College effective December 31, 2021 and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. 


Source: Member
Effective Date: 29 Oct 2018
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Gurpal Singh Mand to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 29, 2018:

College investigations were conducted into whether Dr. Mand engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his emergency medicine practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Mand will not engage in the practice of Emergency Medicine and will not practice in any Urgent Care Clinic.

Dr. Mand will engage in professional education in communications. 

Training

Medical School: Guru Nanak Dev University, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 31 Dec 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 23 Nov 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 16 Jul 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 23 Nov 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jan 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1981