THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:46:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 377 Church Street
Suite 402
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 472-7122
Fax: (905) 472-2290

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 15 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital Uxbridge
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital
LOCATION: Uxbridge

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. P.J. WHELAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 May 2024

Corporation Name: Dr. P.J. Whelan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 377 Church Street
Suite 402
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 472-7122
Fax: (905) 472-2290

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 15 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital Uxbridge
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital
LOCATION: Uxbridge

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. P.J. WHELAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 May 2024

Corporation Name: Dr. P.J. Whelan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICK JOSEPH WHELAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHELAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICK JOSEPH WHELAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHELAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 10 Jun 2016
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 10 Jun 2016
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP:

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 May 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Mar 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 May 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 07 May 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1982