THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 05:04:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1975
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: West Elgin Medical Centre
171 Main Street
West Lorne Ontario N0L 2P0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 768-1326
Fax: (519) 768-2953

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. E. V. Grigore Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Grigore (CPSO#: 52261 )
Business Address: 171 Main Street
West Lorne Ontario N0L 2P0
519-768-1326

Corporation Name: Dr. E. V. Grigore Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Aug 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN
Medical School: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: West Elgin Medical Centre
171 Main Street
West Lorne Ontario N0L 2P0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 768-1326
Fax: (519) 768-2953

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. E. V. Grigore Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Grigore (CPSO#: 52261 )
Business Address: 171 Main Street
West Lorne Ontario N0L 2P0
519-768-1326

Corporation Name: Dr. E. V. Grigore Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Aug 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMIL-VASILE GRIGORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRIGORE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMIL-VASILE GRIGORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRIGORE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 1983
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 1989

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1989

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1986

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 1983