THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 04:01:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Zagreb, 1963
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CROATIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 18 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 200 - 2333 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON M6R 3A6
Date Received: 31 May 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CROATIAN
Medical School: University of Zagreb, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 18 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 200 - 2333 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON M6R 3A6
Date Received: 31 May 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Zagreb, 1963

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1978
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 1988

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 1987

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Mar 1986

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 1978