THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:26:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1971
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 04 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
Docudavit Solutions
28 Eugene Street
Toronto ON M6B 3ZA
Date Received: 07 Jun 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nabil Namis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Aug 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 04 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
Docudavit Solutions
28 Eugene Street
Toronto ON M6B 3ZA
Date Received: 07 Jun 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nabil Namis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Aug 2019

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 02 May 2011
Summary of Decision:
On May 2, 2011, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Nabil Nashat Namis committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. Dr. Namis attend before the panel to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the register;

2. The Registrar impose as terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Namis' certificate of registration:

a. that Dr. Namis shall participate in and successfully complete, at his own expense and within five months of the date of this Order, an educational program in medical ethics approved by the College;

b. that Dr. Namis, at his own expense, shall participate in and successfully complete an educational program in medical recordkeeping for obstetrics and gynecology attached [to the Order] as Schedule "A", with a preceptor, to be approved by the College in its sole discretion and who has within fortyfive days of the date of this Order signed an Undertaking to the College in the form attached [to the Order] as Schedule "B", and shall abide by all recommendations of his preceptor with respect to practice improvements and/or professional development related to his fulfillment of the educational need and achievement of the outcome set out in Schedule "A"; and

3. Each of the abovenoted terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Namis' certificate of registration shall be removed upon successful completion of the corresponding educational program, as required by paragraphs 2(a) and (b) above.

4. Dr. Namis shall, within 30 days, pay the College its costs of this proceeding in the amount of $3,650.00.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 2, 2011

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 02 May 2011
Summary of Decision:
On May 2, 2011, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Nabil Nashat Namis committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. Dr. Namis attend before the panel to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the register;

2. The Registrar impose as terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Namis' certificate of registration:

a. that Dr. Namis shall participate in and successfully complete, at his own expense and within five months of the date of this Order, an educational program in medical ethics approved by the College;

b. that Dr. Namis, at his own expense, shall participate in and successfully complete an educational program in medical recordkeeping for obstetrics and gynecology attached [to the Order] as Schedule "A", with a preceptor, to be approved by the College in its sole discretion and who has within fortyfive days of the date of this Order signed an Undertaking to the College in the form attached [to the Order] as Schedule "B", and shall abide by all recommendations of his preceptor with respect to practice improvements and/or professional development related to his fulfillment of the educational need and achievement of the outcome set out in Schedule "A"; and

3. Each of the abovenoted terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Namis' certificate of registration shall be removed upon successful completion of the corresponding educational program, as required by paragraphs 2(a) and (b) above.

4. Dr. Namis shall, within 30 days, pay the College its costs of this proceeding in the amount of $3,650.00.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 2, 2011

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1971

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 07 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 15 Oct 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 May 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1983
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 07 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Oct 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 15 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 15 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Nov 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 May 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 02 May 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 1983