THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:38:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University College of Dublin, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GAELIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 18 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 42 Terry Fox Dr
Kingston, ON
K7M 8N5
Date Received: 01 Jul 2021

Instructions/Address:
Martin's People's Storage
42 Terry Fox Dr
Kingston, ON K7M 8N5
Tel: 613-545-1362
Fax: 613-544-4388
Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 06 Mar 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GAELIC
Medical School: University College of Dublin, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 18 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 42 Terry Fox Dr
Kingston, ON
K7M 8N5
Date Received: 01 Jul 2021

Instructions/Address:
Martin's People's Storage
42 Terry Fox Dr
Kingston, ON K7M 8N5
Tel: 613-545-1362
Fax: 613-544-4388
Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 06 Mar 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University College of Dublin, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 2021
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 22 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 1983
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Apr 1983