THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:59:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 72 Brant Avenue
Brantford Ontario N3T 5Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 756-0171
Fax: (519) 756-0176

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 72 Brant Avenue
Brantford Ontario N3T 5Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 756-0171
Fax: (519) 756-0176

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EUGENIO CICORIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CICORIA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EUGENIO CICORIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CICORIA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: FSMB (USA)
Notice Type: External Findings - Other Regulatory Body
Effective Date: 14 Nov 2018
Summary:
Due to Action Taken by Another Board/Agency
Failure to Report Adverse Actions Against Self in Accordance with Laws/Rules of the Board.  


Source: FSMB (USA)
Notice Type: External Findings - Other Regulatory Body
Effective Date: 14 Nov 2018
Summary:
Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College.

The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

On November 14, 2018, the Disciplinary Subcommittee of the Michigan Board of Medicine found that Dr. Cicoria had violated the Michigan Public Health Code as a result of the adverse action taken by the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (i.e. the June 2017 undertaking entered into by Dr. Cicoria with CPSO) and by failing to notify the Michigan Board of the undertaking. The Michigan Disciplinary Subcommittee, with Dr. Cicoria’s consent, that his license to practice medicine in the state of Michigan is permanently surrendered. The College was notified of this finding by a report dated December 13, 2018. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: FSMB (USA)
Notice Type: External Findings - Other Regulatory Body
Effective Date: 14 Nov 2018
Summary:
Due to Action Taken by Another Board/Agency
Failure to Report Adverse Actions Against Self in Accordance with Laws/Rules of the Board.  


Source: FSMB (USA)
Notice Type: External Findings - Other Regulatory Body
Effective Date: 14 Nov 2018
Summary:
Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College.

The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

On November 14, 2018, the Disciplinary Subcommittee of the Michigan Board of Medicine found that Dr. Cicoria had violated the Michigan Public Health Code as a result of the adverse action taken by the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (i.e. the June 2017 undertaking entered into by Dr. Cicoria with CPSO) and by failing to notify the Michigan Board of the undertaking. The Michigan Disciplinary Subcommittee, with Dr. Cicoria’s consent, that his license to practice medicine in the state of Michigan is permanently surrendered. The College was notified of this finding by a report dated December 13, 2018. 

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jun 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 08 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1983