THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:21:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101 Queensway West
Suite 210
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 566-9750
Fax: (905) 566-9717
Address: The Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 14 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dennis Izukawa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Jan 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101 Queensway West
Suite 210
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 566-9750
Fax: (905) 566-9717
Address: The Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 14 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dennis Izukawa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Jan 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DENNIS MARK SAKUO IZUKAWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IZUKAWA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DENNIS MARK SAKUO IZUKAWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IZUKAWA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 1988

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1983