THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 04:28:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Minor patients of Dr. Pancer's can access their medical records by contacting Dr. Paoyun Tang CPSO #103277.
Date Received: 24 Apr 2023

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Larry B. Pancer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Pancer (CPSO#: 52647 )
Business Address: 5293 Highway 7
Suite 207
Markham Ontario L3P 1B8
(905) 471-7787
Business Address: 28 Longwater Chase
Unionville ON L3R 4A5
6473881429
Business Address: 133 Indian Circle
Clarksburg Ontario N0H 1J0
6473881429
Business Address: 133 Indian Circle
Clarksburg Ontario N0H 1J0
6473881429
Business Address: 133 Indian Circle
Clarksburg Ontario N0H 1J0
6473881429
Business Address: 133 Indian Cir
Clarksburg ON N0H 1J0
647-388-1429

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Minor patients of Dr. Pancer's can access their medical records by contacting Dr. Paoyun Tang CPSO #103277.
Date Received: 24 Apr 2023

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Larry B. Pancer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Pancer (CPSO#: 52647 )
Business Address: 5293 Highway 7
Suite 207
Markham Ontario L3P 1B8
(905) 471-7787
Business Address: 28 Longwater Chase
Unionville ON L3R 4A5
6473881429
Business Address: 133 Indian Circle
Clarksburg Ontario N0H 1J0
6473881429
Business Address: 133 Indian Circle
Clarksburg Ontario N0H 1J0
6473881429
Business Address: 133 Indian Circle
Clarksburg Ontario N0H 1J0
6473881429
Business Address: 133 Indian Cir
Clarksburg ON N0H 1J0
647-388-1429

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 23 Apr 2025
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 23 Apr 2025

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1983