THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:34:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 101
2300 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-3850
Fax: (905) 813-3853

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 02 Dec 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1985
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 02 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charal and Pereira Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Apr 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 101
2300 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-3850
Fax: (905) 813-3853

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 02 Dec 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1985
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 02 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charal and Pereira Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Apr 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE MARIA JOSEFRIEDA PEREIRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEREIRA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE MARIA JOSEFRIEDA PEREIRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEREIRA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1983