THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:48:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1983
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
16076 Lakeside Dr
PO Box 565
Long Sault, ON K0C 1P0
Date Received: 30 Apr 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. J. Randlett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Dec 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
16076 Lakeside Dr
PO Box 565
Long Sault, ON K0C 1P0
Date Received: 30 Apr 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. J. Randlett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Dec 2017

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1983