THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:07:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 404-460 Main Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8N
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9045700440
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 6120 Midfield Road
Mississauga Ontario L5P 1B1
Phone: 5199428143
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Indiana

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gary Hill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Dec 2020

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 404-460 Main Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8N
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9045700440
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 6120 Midfield Road
Mississauga Ontario L5P 1B1
Phone: 5199428143
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Indiana

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gary Hill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Dec 2020

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GARY VERNON HILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HILL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GARY VERNON HILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HILL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2021
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 04 Sep 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Nov 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1983