THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:38:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1983
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 916 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 1H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 531-6127
Fax: (613) 507-6127
Address: 3725 Bell Line Road
Mountain Grove Ontario K0H 2P0
Phone: 613-217-8649
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3425 Bell Line Road
Sharbot Lake Ontario K0H 2P0
Phone: 6132178649
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 18 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Janet R. McCulloch Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Aug 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 916 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 1H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 531-6127
Fax: (613) 507-6127
Address: 3725 Bell Line Road
Mountain Grove Ontario K0H 2P0
Phone: 613-217-8649
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3425 Bell Line Road
Sharbot Lake Ontario K0H 2P0
Phone: 6132178649
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 18 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Janet R. McCulloch Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Aug 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANET RUTH MCCULLOCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCULLOCH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANET RUTH MCCULLOCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCULLOCH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 May 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1983