THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:41:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 13 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients who are seeking a copy of their medical records may send a request to: [email protected]
Date Received: 12 Oct 2023

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Egerdie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Nov 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 13 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients who are seeking a copy of their medical records may send a request to: [email protected]
Date Received: 12 Oct 2023

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Egerdie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Nov 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUSSELL BLAIR EGERDIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EGERDIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUSSELL BLAIR EGERDIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EGERDIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1983