THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/04/25 02:23:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 20 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert S. Richards Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Feb 2025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 20 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert S. Richards Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Feb 2025

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Proceeding Type: Discipline referral to OPSDT
Date of Decision: 24 Feb 2025
Summary of Decision:

On February 24, 2025, the Tribunal found that Dr. Richards engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by providing medical care and treatment to Patient A, B and C, who were family members/persons close to Dr. Richards. 

 

The Tribunal ordered that:

 

  1. 1. Dr. Richards attend before the panel to be reprimanded 

  1. 2. Dr. Richards pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by March 25, 2025. 

 

More detail can be found in the reasons for decision linked below. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Statement of Uncontested Facts and Plea of No Contest, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected]. 

Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
For more details please visit the OPSDT website

Other Notifications (3)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 23 Feb 2025
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Robert Stanley Richards to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 23, 2025 at 11:59 p.m:
 
Dr. Richards was referred to the Discipline Tribunal on allegations of professional misconduct. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Richards resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction in Canada.


Source: Other
Effective Date: 16 Aug 2023
Summary:
Charges

Robert Richards was charged with the following offence:

1.  2 counts of Sexual assault, between January 1, 2010 and January 20, 2023 contrary to section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date of Charge:  August 16, 2023 
Place of Charge:  London, Ontario
London Police Service


Source: Other
Effective Date: 11 Aug 2023
Summary:
Bail Conditions

On August 11, 2023, the following Conditions of Release were imposed on Robert Richards:

1.  Richards must not communicate, directly or indirectly, with a named person.
2.  Richards must not attend within 200 meters of any known place of residence, education or employment of a named person.
3.  Richards must not attend within 25 meters of a named person.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Proceeding Type: Discipline referral to OPSDT
Date of Decision: 24 Feb 2025
Summary of Decision:

On February 24, 2025, the Tribunal found that Dr. Richards engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by providing medical care and treatment to Patient A, B and C, who were family members/persons close to Dr. Richards. 

 

The Tribunal ordered that:

 

  1. 1. Dr. Richards attend before the panel to be reprimanded 

  1. 2. Dr. Richards pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by March 25, 2025. 

 

More detail can be found in the reasons for decision linked below. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Statement of Uncontested Facts and Plea of No Contest, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected]. 

Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
For more details please visit the OPSDT website

Other Notifications (3)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 23 Feb 2025
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Robert Stanley Richards to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 23, 2025 at 11:59 p.m:
 
Dr. Richards was referred to the Discipline Tribunal on allegations of professional misconduct. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Richards resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction in Canada.


Source: Other
Effective Date: 16 Aug 2023
Summary:
Charges

Robert Richards was charged with the following offence:

1.  2 counts of Sexual assault, between January 1, 2010 and January 20, 2023 contrary to section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date of Charge:  August 16, 2023 
Place of Charge:  London, Ontario
London Police Service


Source: Other
Effective Date: 11 Aug 2023
Summary:
Bail Conditions

On August 11, 2023, the following Conditions of Release were imposed on Robert Richards:

1.  Richards must not communicate, directly or indirectly, with a named person.
2.  Richards must not attend within 200 meters of any known place of residence, education or employment of a named person.
3.  Richards must not attend within 25 meters of a named person.

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 24 Feb 2025
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 12 Feb 2025
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Jun 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 24 Feb 2025

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2025

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Nov 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 03 Nov 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 1991

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1983