THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:52:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sauble Family Health Team
672B Main Street
Sauble Beach Ontario N0H 2G0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 422-1321
Fax: (519)-422-3568

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lawrence Schmidt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Mar 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sauble Family Health Team
672B Main Street
Sauble Beach Ontario N0H 2G0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 422-1321
Fax: (519)-422-3568

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lawrence Schmidt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Mar 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAWRENCE GREGORY SCHMIDT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHMIDT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAWRENCE GREGORY SCHMIDT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHMIDT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jan 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1983