THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:04:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Guy's Hospital Medical School, 1972
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 60 Leonard Ave
Toronto Western Hospital - Altum Health
Toronto ON M5T 0S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1 844 662 5886
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 17 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 14 Nov 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALESE
Medical School: Guy's Hospital Medical School, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 60 Leonard Ave
Toronto Western Hospital - Altum Health
Toronto ON M5T 0S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1 844 662 5886
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 17 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 14 Nov 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TILAK DE FONSEKA MENDIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENDIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TILAK DE FONSEKA MENDIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENDIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Guy's Hospital Medical School, 1972

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1983
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 1983