THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 04:33:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Nacional Autónoma de México Facultad de Medicina, 1974
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 12 Nov 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 12 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad Nacional Autónoma de México Facultad de Medicina, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 12 Nov 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 12 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 11 Dec 2008
Summary of Decision:
On December 11, 2008, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Joffe committed acts of professional misconduct in that he sexually abused patients under clause 51(1)(b.1) of the Health Professional Procedural Code (the (Code() and engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that having regard to all of the circumstances, would be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. The Registrar revoke Dr. Joffe(s certificate of registration effective immediately.
2. Dr. Joffe appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
3. Dr. Joffe reimburse the College for funding provided to patients under the program required under section 85.7 of the Code, by posting an irrovocable letter of credit or other security acceptable to the College, by January 30, 2009, in the amount of $40,000.
4. Dr. Joffe pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650 by January 30, 2009.
5. The results of this proceeding be included in the register.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Dec 11, 2008

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 11 Dec 2008
Summary of Decision:
On December 11, 2008, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Joffe committed acts of professional misconduct in that he sexually abused patients under clause 51(1)(b.1) of the Health Professional Procedural Code (the (Code() and engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that having regard to all of the circumstances, would be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. The Registrar revoke Dr. Joffe(s certificate of registration effective immediately.
2. Dr. Joffe appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
3. Dr. Joffe reimburse the College for funding provided to patients under the program required under section 85.7 of the Code, by posting an irrovocable letter of credit or other security acceptable to the College, by January 30, 2009, in the amount of $40,000.
4. Dr. Joffe pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650 by January 30, 2009.
5. The results of this proceeding be included in the register.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Dec 11, 2008

Training

Medical School: Universidad Nacional Autónoma de México Facultad de Medicina, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 11 Dec 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 31 May 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1983
DETAILS: Revoked: Discipline Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Dec 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 May 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Executive Committee
Date: Effective: 31 May 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1983