THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 04:20:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 05 Feb 2003
Summary of Decision:
On February 5, 2003, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, found Dr. Robert Arlen Rosenberg to have committed acts of professional misconduct pursuant to the Health Professions Procedural Code.

On March 21, 2003, the Discipline Committee ordered, inter alia, that Dr. Rosenberg's certificate of registration be revoked immediately.

On April 15, 2003, Dr. Rosenberg appealed the decision of the Discipline Committee to the Divisional Court. On May 7, 2003, pursuant to subsection 25(1) of the Statutory Powers and Procedures Act, the Court granted Dr. Rosenberg's motion to stay the decision pending the outcome of the appeal on the condition that terms, conditions and limitation be imposed on his certificate of registration effective May 7, 2003.

On June 16 2005, the Divisional Court heard the appeal. On September 14, 2005, the Divisional Court released its decision and reasons dismissing the appeal. Therefore, the decision of the Discipline Committee went into in effect.

On September 28, 2005, Dr. Rosenberg filed a Notice of Motion for Leave to Appeal to the Court of Appeal. The decision of the Discipline Committee remained in effect. On January 17, 2006, Dr. Rosenberg brought a motion before the Court of Appeal to stay the penalty order of the Discipline Committee of March 21, 2003 upheld by the Divisional Court on September 14, 2005, pending the decision of the Court of Appeal. The Court of Appeal granted the stay on the condition that Dr. Rosenberg ensure that a third party monitor, who is a member of a regulated health profession and who is approved by the College, attend all medical examinations of female patients that he conducts, including counselling, palliative care, hospital visits and examination of female children in the company of a parent. Dr. Rosenberg was permitted to propose other monitors subject to the College's approval.

As from 11:59 p.m., January 17, 2006, the College imposed terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Robert Arlen Rosenberg, pursuant to the order of the Court of Appeal.

On November 2, 2006, the Ontario Court of Appeal dismissed Dr. Rosenberg's appeal.

The terms, conditions and limitations imposed on January 17, 2006 are no longer in effect. The certificate of registration, issued in the name of Dr. Robert Arlen Rosenberg, is revoked effective November 2, 2006 at 5:00 p.m.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 2006-11-02
Hearing Date(s): Feb 11, 2002

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 05 Feb 2003
Summary of Decision:
On February 5, 2003, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, found Dr. Robert Arlen Rosenberg to have committed acts of professional misconduct pursuant to the Health Professions Procedural Code.

On March 21, 2003, the Discipline Committee ordered, inter alia, that Dr. Rosenberg's certificate of registration be revoked immediately.

On April 15, 2003, Dr. Rosenberg appealed the decision of the Discipline Committee to the Divisional Court. On May 7, 2003, pursuant to subsection 25(1) of the Statutory Powers and Procedures Act, the Court granted Dr. Rosenberg's motion to stay the decision pending the outcome of the appeal on the condition that terms, conditions and limitation be imposed on his certificate of registration effective May 7, 2003.

On June 16 2005, the Divisional Court heard the appeal. On September 14, 2005, the Divisional Court released its decision and reasons dismissing the appeal. Therefore, the decision of the Discipline Committee went into in effect.

On September 28, 2005, Dr. Rosenberg filed a Notice of Motion for Leave to Appeal to the Court of Appeal. The decision of the Discipline Committee remained in effect. On January 17, 2006, Dr. Rosenberg brought a motion before the Court of Appeal to stay the penalty order of the Discipline Committee of March 21, 2003 upheld by the Divisional Court on September 14, 2005, pending the decision of the Court of Appeal. The Court of Appeal granted the stay on the condition that Dr. Rosenberg ensure that a third party monitor, who is a member of a regulated health profession and who is approved by the College, attend all medical examinations of female patients that he conducts, including counselling, palliative care, hospital visits and examination of female children in the company of a parent. Dr. Rosenberg was permitted to propose other monitors subject to the College's approval.

As from 11:59 p.m., January 17, 2006, the College imposed terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Robert Arlen Rosenberg, pursuant to the order of the Court of Appeal.

On November 2, 2006, the Ontario Court of Appeal dismissed Dr. Rosenberg's appeal.

The terms, conditions and limitations imposed on January 17, 2006 are no longer in effect. The certificate of registration, issued in the name of Dr. Robert Arlen Rosenberg, is revoked effective November 2, 2006 at 5:00 p.m.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 2006-11-02
Hearing Date(s): Feb 11, 2002

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 02 Nov 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Divisional Court. Effective: 17 Jan 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 May 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1983
DETAILS: Revoked: Discipline Committee.
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 2006

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Divisional Court.
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2006

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 May 2003
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 07 May 2003

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Sep 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 1983