THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:37:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite B-2
194 Main Street
Ottawa Ontario K1S 1C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 232-2814
Fax: (613) 232-2779

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 26 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite B-2
194 Main Street
Ottawa Ontario K1S 1C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 232-2814
Fax: (613) 232-2779

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 26 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN GEORGE THOMSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN GEORGE THOMSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1980
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 1985

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1983

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1982

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1981

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1980

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1979