THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:36:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mary Bergund
Community Health Centre Hub,
1100 Main Street, Ignace,
Ontario, P0T1T0.
Ignace Ontario P0T 1T0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-807-934-2251
Fax: 807-934-6552

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sante Manitouwadge Health Manitouwadge
St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Rainy River Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities Rainy River
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Sioux Lookout Zone Hospital Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Sante Manitouwadge Health
LOCATION: Manitouwadge

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Rainy River Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities
LOCATION: Rainy River

HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Zone Hospital
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mary Bergund
Community Health Centre Hub,
1100 Main Street, Ignace,
Ontario, P0T1T0.
Ignace Ontario P0T 1T0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-807-934-2251
Fax: 807-934-6552

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sante Manitouwadge Health Manitouwadge
St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Rainy River Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities Rainy River
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Sioux Lookout Zone Hospital Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Sante Manitouwadge Health
LOCATION: Manitouwadge

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Rainy River Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities
LOCATION: Rainy River

HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Zone Hospital
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY ROBERT BRADLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRADLEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY ROBERT BRADLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRADLEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 Oct 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 1984

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 1984

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Sep 1984

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1983