THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:59:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Nuclear Medicine Division
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8528
Fax: (613) 737-8705

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 24 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Nuclear Medicine Division
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8528
Fax: (613) 737-8705

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 24 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANCOIS RAYMOND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAYMOND is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANCOIS RAYMOND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAYMOND is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 1988

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1983