THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:48:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 06 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record may contact: Kingston General Hospital, 76 Stuart Street, Kingston, ON, K7L 2V6, Tel: 613-548-6046
Date Received: 01 May 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Flavin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Sep 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 06 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record may contact: Kingston General Hospital, 76 Stuart Street, Kingston, ON, K7L 2V6, Tel: 613-548-6046
Date Received: 01 May 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Flavin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Sep 2018

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 1988

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 1987

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1983