THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:18:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: C/o. Dr. Steven Connor MD
PO Box 574
Minden, ON
K0M 2K0
Date Received: 02 Jun 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S.A. Connor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Aug 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: C/o. Dr. Steven Connor MD
PO Box 574
Minden, ON
K0M 2K0
Date Received: 02 Jun 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S.A. Connor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Aug 2022

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1983