THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:13:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, DUTCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Office of Clinical Trials
Health Canada
1600 Scott Street
K1A OK9
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Office of Clinical Trials,
Therapeutic Products Directorate
Health Canada,Holland Cross,Tower B
Ottawa K1A 0K9
Ottawa Ontario K1A 0K9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 16 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Medical Records Department
501 Smyth Road,
Ottawa Hospital,
Ottawa K1H 8L6
Date Received: 27 Apr 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Van Der Jagt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Sep 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, DUTCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Office of Clinical Trials
Health Canada
1600 Scott Street
K1A OK9
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Office of Clinical Trials,
Therapeutic Products Directorate
Health Canada,Holland Cross,Tower B
Ottawa K1A 0K9
Ottawa Ontario K1A 0K9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 16 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Medical Records Department
501 Smyth Road,
Ottawa Hospital,
Ottawa K1H 8L6
Date Received: 27 Apr 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Van Der Jagt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Sep 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD HENRY CONSTANTINE VAN DER JAGT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN DER JAGT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD HENRY CONSTANTINE VAN DER JAGT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN DER JAGT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2022
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 23 Mar 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 29 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 23 Mar 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 1990

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 1989

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Oct 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1983