THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 04:41:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Andhra University, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 05 Jun 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Appletree Medical Centre
Unit 1A-2
1595 Merivale Road
Ottawa ON K2B 7Y6
Date Received: 04 Jan 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Andhra University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 05 Jun 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Appletree Medical Centre
Unit 1A-2
1595 Merivale Road
Ottawa ON K2B 7Y6
Date Received: 04 Jan 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 08 Feb 2016
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 08 Feb 2016
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP.

Training

Medical School: Andhra University, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 04 Jan 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 15 Nov 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Jan 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1982
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1981
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 1994

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 1993

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1984

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 1983

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1982

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 1981