THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:35:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 18 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
Child and Parent Resource Institute
600 Sanatorium Rd
London, ON N6H 3W7

Huron Perth Centre
63 Lorne Ave E #2A
Stratford, ON N5A 6S4
Date Received: 17 Dec 2019

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact the Child and Parent Resource Institute (CPRI) at: 519-858-2774.
Date Received: 11 Dec 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 18 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
Child and Parent Resource Institute
600 Sanatorium Rd
London, ON N6H 3W7

Huron Perth Centre
63 Lorne Ave E #2A
Stratford, ON N5A 6S4
Date Received: 17 Dec 2019

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact the Child and Parent Resource Institute (CPRI) at: 519-858-2774.
Date Received: 11 Dec 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 17 Dec 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1982
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1979
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jan 1987

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 1986

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1983

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1982

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1979