THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:25:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Finch University of Health Sciences, 1974
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital For Sick Children
Department Of Cardiology
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-7500
Fax: (416) 813-7547
Address: University Health Network - TGH
Division of Cardiology
200 Elizabeth Street,
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 06 Dec 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 12 Mar 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 12 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Finch University of Health Sciences, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital For Sick Children
Department Of Cardiology
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-7500
Fax: (416) 813-7547
Address: University Health Network - TGH
Division of Cardiology
200 Elizabeth Street,
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 06 Dec 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 12 Mar 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 12 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LELAND NATHAN BENSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LELAND NATHAN BENSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Finch University of Health Sciences, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1979
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 1983

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1979

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1974