THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 03:16:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Leicester, 1982
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 08 Jun 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Suite 409
3155 Harvester Road
Burlington ON L7N 3V2
Tel: 905-333-5437
Date Received: 24 May 2016

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edward and Frances Hughes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Jun 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Leicester, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 08 Jun 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Suite 409
3155 Harvester Road
Burlington ON L7N 3V2
Tel: 905-333-5437
Date Received: 24 May 2016

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edward and Frances Hughes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Jun 2017

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Leicester, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1983
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016


DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 1983