THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:40:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: For patients seeking access to their medical records or for any related inquiries, please contact Records Management LTD at:

Phone: 1-800-775-0093
Mailing Address: 1 High Meadow Place, Suite #13, Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 31 Jan 2025

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Vincent de Paul Hospital Providence Continuing Care Centre Brockville
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
HOSPITAL: St Vincent de Paul Hospital Providence Continuing Care Centre
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: For patients seeking access to their medical records or for any related inquiries, please contact Records Management LTD at:

Phone: 1-800-775-0093
Mailing Address: 1 High Meadow Place, Suite #13, Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 31 Jan 2025

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Vincent de Paul Hospital Providence Continuing Care Centre Brockville
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
HOSPITAL: St Vincent de Paul Hospital Providence Continuing Care Centre
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Discipline Committee
21 Nov 2011
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Discipline Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 21 2011
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from 11:59 p.m., November 21, 2011, by order of the Discipline Committee of
the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms,
conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held
by Dr. Alan Wayne Redekopp:

(a) Dr. Redekopp is probibited from prescribing:

(i) Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under
the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(ii) Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(iii) Controlled Drugs (from Schedule G of the Regulations under the Food
and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27), with the exception of
testosterone; or

(iv) Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines
and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled
Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c.19)

(A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix 1 to the Compendium of
Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached [to the Order] as Schedule
"A"; and the current regulatory lists are attached [to the Order] as
Schedule "B").

(b) Dr. Redekopp shall post a clearly visible sign in his waiting room in the
form set out at Schedule "C" [to the Order]. For further clarity, this
sign shall state as follows: "Dr. Redekopp has relinquished his
prescribing privileges with respect to Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic
Preparations and Controlled Drugs other than testosterone".

(c) Dr. Redekop shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice
and such other steps as the College may take for the purpose of
monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms of the Order.

(d) Dr. Redekopp shall, at his own expense, participate in and successfully
complete the following College course:

(i) Medical Record-Keeping for Physicians.


VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from 11:59 p.m., November 21, 2011, by order of the Discipline Committee of
the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms,
conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held
by Dr. Alan Wayne Redekopp:

(a) Dr. Redekopp is probibited from prescribing:

(i) Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under
the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(ii) Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(iii) Controlled Drugs (from Schedule G of the Regulations under the Food
and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27), with the exception of
testosterone; or

(iv) Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines
and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled
Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c.19)

(A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix 1 to the Compendium of
Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached [to the Order] as Schedule
"A"; and the current regulatory lists are attached [to the Order] as
Schedule "B").

(b) Dr. Redekopp shall post a clearly visible sign in his waiting room in the
form set out at Schedule "C" [to the Order]. For further clarity, this
sign shall state as follows: "Dr. Redekopp has relinquished his
prescribing privileges with respect to Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic
Preparations and Controlled Drugs other than testosterone".

(c) Dr. Redekop shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice
and such other steps as the College may take for the purpose of
monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms of the Order.

(d) Dr. Redekopp shall, at his own expense, participate in and successfully
complete the following College course:

(i) Medical Record-Keeping for Physicians.


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 21 Nov 2011
Summary of Decision:
On November 21, 2011, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Alan Wayne Redekopp committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his record-keeping and documentation and in his prescribing of narcotics and controlled substances.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. the Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Redekopp's certificate of registration:

a. Dr. Redekopp is prohibited from prescribing:

(i) Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(ii) Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(iii) Controlled Drugs (from Schedule G of the Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27), with the exception of testosterone; or

(iv) Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19)

(A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached [to the Order] as Schedule "A"; and the current regulatory lists are attached [to the Order] as Schedule "B").

b. Dr. Redekopp shall post a clearly visible sign in his waiting room in the form set out at Schedule "C" [to the Order]. For further clarity, this sign shall state as follows: "Dr. Redekopp has relinquished his prescribing privileges with respect to Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations and Controlled Drugs other than testosterone".

c. Dr. Redekopp shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice and such other steps as the College may take for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms of the Order.

d. Dr. Redekopp shall, at his own expense, participate in and successfully complete the following College course:

(i) Medical Record-Keeping for Physicians.

2. Dr. Redekopp appear before it to be reprimanded.

3. Dr. Redekopp pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650 within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order.
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): November 21, 2011

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 21 Nov 2011
Summary of Decision:
On November 21, 2011, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Alan Wayne Redekopp committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his record-keeping and documentation and in his prescribing of narcotics and controlled substances.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. the Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Redekopp's certificate of registration:

a. Dr. Redekopp is prohibited from prescribing:

(i) Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(ii) Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(iii) Controlled Drugs (from Schedule G of the Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27), with the exception of testosterone; or

(iv) Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19)

(A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached [to the Order] as Schedule "A"; and the current regulatory lists are attached [to the Order] as Schedule "B").

b. Dr. Redekopp shall post a clearly visible sign in his waiting room in the form set out at Schedule "C" [to the Order]. For further clarity, this sign shall state as follows: "Dr. Redekopp has relinquished his prescribing privileges with respect to Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations and Controlled Drugs other than testosterone".

c. Dr. Redekopp shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice and such other steps as the College may take for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms of the Order.

d. Dr. Redekopp shall, at his own expense, participate in and successfully complete the following College course:

(i) Medical Record-Keeping for Physicians.

2. Dr. Redekopp appear before it to be reprimanded.

3. Dr. Redekopp pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650 within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order.
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): November 21, 2011

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee. Effective: 21 Nov 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1983
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee.
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Nov 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Nov 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Aug 1983