THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:56:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of London, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1385 Blythe Rd
Mississauga ON L5H 2C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164198300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology
Effective: 24 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 06 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI
Medical School: University of London, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1385 Blythe Rd
Mississauga ON L5H 2C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164198300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology
Effective: 24 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 06 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PIYUSH RANCHHODBHAI PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PIYUSH RANCHHODBHAI PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of London, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1983
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 1983