THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:03:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Cardiology
Effective: 07 Dec 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Effective Date: 11 Mar 2009
Summary:
NOTICE OF REVOCATION OF PRIVILEGES:

On June 2, 2009, Windsor Regional Hospital notified the College that Dr. Israel Shoel Rosenhek's privileges were revoked, effective March 11, 2009.

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rosenhek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Jul 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Cardiology
Effective: 07 Dec 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Effective Date: 11 Mar 2009
Summary:
NOTICE OF REVOCATION OF PRIVILEGES:

On June 2, 2009, Windsor Regional Hospital notified the College that Dr. Israel Shoel Rosenhek's privileges were revoked, effective March 11, 2009.

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rosenhek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Jul 2018

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Discipline Committee
11 Oct 2017
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Discipline Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 11 2017
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon



(1 of 2)
As from October 11, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Israel Shoel
Rosenhek, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Rosenhek
to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking")
of
DR. ISRAEL SHOEL ROSENHEK
("Dr. Rosenhek")
to
COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")



A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
amended;

"Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
public.

(2) I, Dr. Rosenhek, certificate of registration number 53522, am a member of
the College. The College has received information regarding my standard
of practice.

B. UNDERTAKING

(3) I, Dr. Rosenhek, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
Undertaking, effective October 11, 2017.

(4) Practice Restriction

(a) I, Dr. Rosenhek, undertake that I will see a maximum of three (3)
patients per hour.

(5) Patient Encounter Log

(a) I, Dr. Rosenhek, shall keep one log of all patient encounters, in
the form set out at Schedule "A", which will include at least the
following information:

(I) the date of the patient encounter;
(ii) the name of the patient with chart / file number;
(iii) the start time of the patient encounter;

(iv) the end time of the patient encounter; and
(v) my initials.

(b) I, Dr. Rosenhek, undertake and agree to keep one single log of
patient encounters, regardless of the number of my Practice
Location(s) (defined below).

(C) I, Dr. Rosenhek, undertake and agree to submit the original log of
patient encounters to the College on a monthly basis.

(d) I, Dr. Rosenhek, undertake and agree to maintain my own copy of the
log of patient encounters at all times, and to make it available to
the College upon request.

(6) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Rosenhek, undertake to inform the College of each and every
location where I practice including, but not limited to clinic(s)
and office(s) in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice
Location(s)"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.
Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and
all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing
practice at that location.

(b) I, Dr. Rosenhek, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
charts by a College representative solely for the purposes of
monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(C) I, Dr. Rosenhek, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution
that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Rosenhek, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
form, attached hereto as Appendix "B".

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(7) I, Dr. Rosenhek, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(8) I, Dr. Rosenhek, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
Undertaking.

(9) I, Dr. Rosenhek, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
right to do so.

(10) I, Dr. Rosenhek, acknowledge that the College will provide this
Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").
(11) I, Dr. Rosenhek, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
the Discipline Committee.

(12) I, Dr. Rosenhek, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(13) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Rosenhek, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Rosenhek, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the
following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Dr. Rosenhek must not see more than a maximum of three
patients per hour.

D. CONSENT

(14) I, Dr. Rosenhek, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
all Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to
the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
Undertaking.

(2 of 2)
As from 11:59 p.m., November 8, 2010, by order of the Discipline Committee of
the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms,
conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held
by Dr. Israel Shoel Rosenhek:

a. Dr. Rosenhek shall practise solely in an office setting and shall
not engage in any hospital-based practice. Dr. Rosenhek may bring
a motion before a panel of the Discipline Committee to vary this
condition, but not earlier than nine (9) months after the date of
this Order;

b. At his own expense, Dr. Rosenhek shall engage in a program of
continuing medical education in cardiology that fulfills all of the
Maintenance of Certification requirements of the Royal College of
Physicians and Surgeons and shall maintain a record of such
activities to be produced to the College upon request;

c. At his own expense, Dr. Rosenhek shall successfully complete,
within approximately 18 months, the following education programs:

I. the College's Medical Record-Keeping for Physicians
course, including the follow-up component; and

ii. an education program in communications acceptable to
the College,

and shall provide proof to the College of his successful completion
thereof.

d. Dr. Rosenhek shall practise only under the supervision of a
clinical supervisor retained at his own expense and approved by the
College who has signed an undertaking in the form attached as
Schedule A, and will abide at his own expense by all
recommendations of his supervisor with respect to his practice,
including with respect to any practice improvements and/or ongoing
professional development and/or education.

e. If, at any time after 24 months have passed since the commencement
of the clinical supervision of his practice set out at paragraph
(d) above, Dr. Rosenhek's clinical supervisor is of the opinion
that Dr. Rosenhek is ready to practice without clinical
supervision, such clinical supervision shall be discontinued only
upon:

I. an assessment of Dr. Rosenhek's practice, undertaken by
a College-appointed assessor at Dr. Rosenhek's expense,
the results of which are satisfactory to the College;
and

ii. the approval of the College.

f. In any 24-hour period, Dr. Rosenhek will see no more than the lower
of (I) 30 patients, and (ii) the number of patients determined by
his clinical supervisor.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon



(1 of 2)
As from October 11, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Israel Shoel
Rosenhek, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Rosenhek
to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking")
of
DR. ISRAEL SHOEL ROSENHEK
("Dr. Rosenhek")
to
COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")



A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
amended;

"Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
public.

(2) I, Dr. Rosenhek, certificate of registration number 53522, am a member of
the College. The College has received information regarding my standard
of practice.

B. UNDERTAKING

(3) I, Dr. Rosenhek, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
Undertaking, effective October 11, 2017.

(4) Practice Restriction

(a) I, Dr. Rosenhek, undertake that I will see a maximum of three (3)
patients per hour.

(5) Patient Encounter Log

(a) I, Dr. Rosenhek, shall keep one log of all patient encounters, in
the form set out at Schedule "A", which will include at least the
following information:

(I) the date of the patient encounter;
(ii) the name of the patient with chart / file number;
(iii) the start time of the patient encounter;

(iv) the end time of the patient encounter; and
(v) my initials.

(b) I, Dr. Rosenhek, undertake and agree to keep one single log of
patient encounters, regardless of the number of my Practice
Location(s) (defined below).

(C) I, Dr. Rosenhek, undertake and agree to submit the original log of
patient encounters to the College on a monthly basis.

(d) I, Dr. Rosenhek, undertake and agree to maintain my own copy of the
log of patient encounters at all times, and to make it available to
the College upon request.

(6) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Rosenhek, undertake to inform the College of each and every
location where I practice including, but not limited to clinic(s)
and office(s) in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice
Location(s)"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.
Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and
all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing
practice at that location.

(b) I, Dr. Rosenhek, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
charts by a College representative solely for the purposes of
monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(C) I, Dr. Rosenhek, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution
that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Rosenhek, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
form, attached hereto as Appendix "B".

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(7) I, Dr. Rosenhek, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(8) I, Dr. Rosenhek, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
Undertaking.

(9) I, Dr. Rosenhek, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
right to do so.

(10) I, Dr. Rosenhek, acknowledge that the College will provide this
Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").
(11) I, Dr. Rosenhek, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
the Discipline Committee.

(12) I, Dr. Rosenhek, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(13) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Rosenhek, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Rosenhek, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the
following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Dr. Rosenhek must not see more than a maximum of three
patients per hour.

D. CONSENT

(14) I, Dr. Rosenhek, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
all Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to
the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
Undertaking.

(2 of 2)
As from 11:59 p.m., November 8, 2010, by order of the Discipline Committee of
the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms,
conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held
by Dr. Israel Shoel Rosenhek:

a. Dr. Rosenhek shall practise solely in an office setting and shall
not engage in any hospital-based practice. Dr. Rosenhek may bring
a motion before a panel of the Discipline Committee to vary this
condition, but not earlier than nine (9) months after the date of
this Order;

b. At his own expense, Dr. Rosenhek shall engage in a program of
continuing medical education in cardiology that fulfills all of the
Maintenance of Certification requirements of the Royal College of
Physicians and Surgeons and shall maintain a record of such
activities to be produced to the College upon request;

c. At his own expense, Dr. Rosenhek shall successfully complete,
within approximately 18 months, the following education programs:

I. the College's Medical Record-Keeping for Physicians
course, including the follow-up component; and

ii. an education program in communications acceptable to
the College,

and shall provide proof to the College of his successful completion
thereof.

d. Dr. Rosenhek shall practise only under the supervision of a
clinical supervisor retained at his own expense and approved by the
College who has signed an undertaking in the form attached as
Schedule A, and will abide at his own expense by all
recommendations of his supervisor with respect to his practice,
including with respect to any practice improvements and/or ongoing
professional development and/or education.

e. If, at any time after 24 months have passed since the commencement
of the clinical supervision of his practice set out at paragraph
(d) above, Dr. Rosenhek's clinical supervisor is of the opinion
that Dr. Rosenhek is ready to practice without clinical
supervision, such clinical supervision shall be discontinued only
upon:

I. an assessment of Dr. Rosenhek's practice, undertaken by
a College-appointed assessor at Dr. Rosenhek's expense,
the results of which are satisfactory to the College;
and

ii. the approval of the College.

f. In any 24-hour period, Dr. Rosenhek will see no more than the lower
of (I) 30 patients, and (ii) the number of patients determined by
his clinical supervisor.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (3)

Date of Decision: 11 Oct 2017
Summary of Decision:
On October 11, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Rosenhek committed an act of professional misconduct in that has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all of the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as unprofessional by practicing medicine without clinical supervision, in breach a 2010 Order of the Discipline Committee and contrary to the terms, conditions, and limitations on his certificate of registration.

Dr. Rosenhek is a cardiologist with a practice in Toronto, Ontario. Prior to 2016, he also had a practice in Windsor, Ontario.

2010 Discipline Committee Order

On November 8, 2010, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Rosenhek had committed an act of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in cardiology between 2005 and 2007 in his care of multiple patients by:
a) failing to appropriately manage cardiac risk factors, such as dyslipidemia, and to prescribe appropriate therapy to reduce such risk;
b) failing to perform indicated investigations;
c) failing to diagnose medical conditions appropriately and in a sufficiently timely manner;
d) failing to appropriately monitor and/or ensure monitoring of complications of medications;
e) failing to monitor and act upon test results in an appropriate and sufficiently timely manner;
f) failing to engage in appropriate discharge planning for patients in the hospital, including failing to make appropriate and necessary arrangements for care and follow-up; and/or
g) failing to maintain legible and sufficiently detailed records of his care and treatment of patients.

The Discipline Committee ordered that the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Rosenhek’s certificate of registration for an indefinite period of time:

i) Dr. Rosenhek shall practise only under the supervision of a Clinical Supervisor retained at his own expense and approved by the College, and will abide at his own expense by all recommendations of his supervisor with respect to his practice, including with respect to any practice improvements and/or ongoing professional development and/or education;
ii) If, at any time after 24 months have passed since the commencement of the clinical supervision of his practice, Dr. Rosenhek’s clinical supervisor is of the opinion that Dr. Rosenhek is ready to practice without clinical supervision, such clinical supervision shall be discontinued only upon:
a. an assessment of Dr. Rosenhek’s practice, undertaken by a College-appointed assessor; and
b. at Dr. Rosenhek’s expense, the results of which are satisfactory to the College; and the approval of the College.

Terms of Clinical Supervision

As a result of the November 8, 2010 Discipline Committee Order, Dr. Rosenhek engaged a Clinical Supervisor, who undertook to act as Clinical Supervisor for Dr. Rosenhek, for the duration of at least 24 months. After 3 months of clinical supervision, the level of supervision could be varied at Clinical Supervisor’ discretion and with the approval of the College, provided that clinical supervision continued for at least 24 months in total. The Clinical Supervisor agreed to submit a written report to the College on a monthly basis for the duration of the clinical supervision.

The Clinical Supervisor further agreed that at any time after 24 months, if he is of the opinion that Dr. Rosenhek is ready to practise without clinical supervision, he shall advise the College of this so that the College may arrange for a practice reassessment to be conducted by an assessor of its choice. In such a case, the clinical supervision was not to terminate unless and until: (a) the College receives, evaluates, and is satisfied by the results of the practice reassessment; and (b) the College provides its approval for the termination of clinical supervision of Dr. Rosenhek’s practice.

Clinical Supervision and Breach of the 2010 Discipline Committee Order

The Clinical Supervisor provided the College with supervision reports during the period from January 14, 2011 to August 15, 2014.

On May 16, 2011, the Clinical Supervisor recommended that the number of patient charts reviewed per week be reduced from 10 to 5. The College agreed to this change on May 31, 2011. This was the only variation of the terms of Dr. Rosenhek’s clinical supervision for which permission was sought from the College, and the only variation approved by the College.

On December 8, 2011 and on June 20, 2012 the College advised the Clinical Supervisor that his reports did not contain enough information to determine whether Dr. Rosenhek was practising within the standard of practice, and requested that his future reports contain more fulsome information.

On September 6, 2012, the Clinical Supervisor reported that Dr. Rosenhek has made tremendous improvements in his practice and that he is at the point to practise without clinical supervision. The College responded on October 15, 2012, indicating that pursuant to the Discipline Committee Order, the 24-month period of clinical supervision is calculated from the time the supervision commences, and, therefore, the earliest date on which Dr. Rosenhek’s supervision could potentially end is on a date after November 2012.

On January 10 and April 11, 2013, respectively, the Clinical Supervisor reported that in his opinion the chart reviews could be eliminated and that he believes that it would be appropriate to end this ongoing review.

The College responded on June 13, 2013, indicating that pursuant to the Discipline Committee Order, the clinical supervision must continue until Dr. Rosenhek undergoes reassessment by the College and the discontinuation of the supervision is approved by the College following a review of the assessor’s report. The College informed the Clinical Supervisor that the review was being arranged and that it could take six months to complete, during which time he was to provide supervision of Dr. Rosenhek’s practice, until the College approves discontinuation of supervision.

The College was in correspondence with Dr. Rosenhek from July 2013 to March 2014 in an attempt to schedule practice reassessment. Dr. Rosenhek’s practice reassessment proceeded in March 2014.

On April 9, 2014 and on April 11, 2014, the Clinical Supervisor reported to the College that he has provided clinical supervision of Dr. Rosenhek’s practice since November 2010, and that it was his understanding that the supervision would last for 24 months, until November 2013. He indicated that he had no concerns with Dr. Rosenhek’s practice, that there is no further value in continuing to do reviews of Dr. Rosenhek’s records, and that he believes that he had completed his initial agreement with the College.

On April 9, 2014, the College wrote to the clinical supervisor, indicating that Dr. Rosenhek is expected to practise under supervision until his practice reassessment is completed, that Dr. Rosenhek is currently in the process of submitting the information required for the reassessment and to continue to provide supervision as per his undertaking until the reassessment is completed and the College communicates approval of its discontinuation. On July 30, 2014, the College wrote to the Clinical Supervisor to provide him with templates for his future reports and requesting that he completed and submitted the reports each month.

The Clinical Supervisor’s last supervision report dated July 16, 2014 was received by the College on August 15, 2014. On August 25, 2014, the College wrote to the Clinical Supervisor requesting him to submit the August 2014 report, but no response was received .

Following the College’s inquiry during the practice reassessment as to whether Dr. Rosenhek’s practice is still under the clinical supervision as per the 2010 Discipline Committee’s Order, Dr. Rosenhek’s counsel informed the College on October 8, 2015 that the Clinical Supervisor had not received the College’s letter of August 25, 2014 and that the Supervisor was of the understanding that no further reports were required of him, and that he advised Dr. Rosenhek that ongoing supervision was not required as he had fulfilled his undertaking. Dr. Rosenhek’s counsel further indicated that the Clinical Supervisor now recognizes that he wrongly interpreted his obligations under his undertaking and that he regrets his error.

On October 3, 2017, Dr. Rosenhek advised the College that following the College’s letter of September 15, 2015, he has sent copies of his patient charts to the Clinical Supervisor for the period from August 2014 to August 2015, and that he continued to periodically provide his records from September 2015 until approximately March 2016.

After July 2014, Dr. Rosenhek continued to practise medicine without supervision, in breach of the requirements in the 2010 Discipline Committee Order; he did not meet and did not follow-up with the Clinical Supervisor to determine if he was reviewing the patient charts that he resumed sending to the Supervisor after September 2015.

The College did not advise either the Clinical Supervisor or Dr. Rosenhek that supervision was no longer required. The College repeatedly advised the Clinical Supervisor that his clinical supervision of Dr. Rosenhek was to continue until he was advised by the College that it approved of the discontinuation of supervision. The College never approved the discontinuation of Dr. Rosenhek’s supervision. Dr. Rosenhek did not attempt to confirm with the College whether his apparent understanding, or the Clinical Supervisor’s apparent advice, that supervision was no longer required, were correct. Similarly, at no time did Dr. Rosenhek bring a motion to vary the terms of the 2010 Discipline Committee Order to permit him to return to unsupervised practice.

Prior Dispositions by the Complaints Committee

In November 2003, the Complaints Committee of the College required Dr. Rosenhek to attend at the College to be cautioned when aspects of his practice, and his response to a College complaint, were found to be concerning. Dr. Rosenhek was cautioned with regard to, among other things, the intemperate nature of his response to the patient complaint, the “threatening and intimidating tone” of which the Committee found to be “unnecessarily belligerent in the extreme”.

In June 2004, the Complaints Committee of the College required Dr. Rosenhek to attend at the College to be cautioned regarding his professional communications.

In October 2006, the Complaints Committee of the College cautioned Dr. Rosenhek regarding his communications with patients and the importance of maintaining a professional and courteous demeanour.

In December 2008, the Complaints Committee of the College required Dr. Rosenhek to attend at the College to be cautioned regarding his professional attitude and demeanour in interacting with a patient, and the importance of understanding the fundamental nature of positive and effective communications
with patients.

2013 Discipline Committee decision

On October 21, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Rosenhek had engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional for:
- falsely representing himself as a member of the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada and using the “FRCP(C)” designation when in fact he was not in good standing with the Royal College because of his failure to pay fees and his failure to report his continuing medical education hours pursuant to the Royal College’s Maintenance of Competence (“MOC”) program, between December 1986 when was removed from the register of Fellows in good standing with the Royal College because of his failure to pay annual dues and November 2008 when he paid his dues; and
- providing incomplete and inaccurate information to the Windsor Regional Hospital (where he held privileges) as part of its credentialing/re-appointment process regarding his compliance with a program of continuing medical education between 2006 and 2008.

As a result, Dr. Rosenhek was required to appear before the panel to be reprimanded, and to pay costs to the College.

March 23, 2016 Undertaking in lieu of s. 37 Order

On March 23, 2016 and on July 21, 2016 Dr. Rosenhek entered into interim undertakings with the College, which remained in effect until the date the Discipline Committee disposed of his discipline case.

Dr. Rosenhek undertook, among other things, to limit his practice to an initial maximum of the equivalent of two days per month, which limit was later raised to three days per month. He also agreed to practice under the supervision of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College, who was required to meet with Dr. Rosenhek once per month to review at least ten patient charts from the equivalent of each full day of patient care provided by Dr. Rosenhek, and to submit written reports to the College at least once every two months.

As a result of the interim undertakings, Dr. Rosenhek practised under the supervision of a different Clinical Supervisor, beginning March 23, 2016. In early 2017, the new Clinical Supervisor advised that he would be discontinuing his supervision of Dr. Rosenhek’s practice as of April 30, 2017. Dr. Rosenhek was not able to locate a replacement supervisor. Dr. Rosenhek has not practiced medicine since May 1, 2017.

No concerns regarding Dr. Rosenhek’s compliance with the interim undertakings have been identified by either the Clinical Supervisor or the College’s compliance monitor.

October 11, 2017 Undertaking

Dr. Rosenhek has entered into an undertaking with the College, dated October 11, 2017, by which he has agreed, among other things, that he shall see a maximum of three patients per hour.

On October 11, 2017, the Committee ordered and directed that:

- the Registrar suspend Dr. Rosenhek’s certificate of registration for a period of one (1) month commencing on October 12, 2017.
- Dr. Rosenhek appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
- Dr. Rosenhek pay costs to the College in the amount of $5,500.00 within 30 days of the date of this Order.
- the results of this proceeding be included in the register.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): October 11, 2017

Date of Decision: 06 Aug 2013
Summary of Decision:
On August 6, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Israel Shoel Rosenhek committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Rosenhek did not contest the allegation.

Dr. Rosenhek was certified as a specialist in cardiology and internal medicine by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada effective December 7, 1983 and June 12, 1984, respectively. He continues to hold these qualifications. In January 1984, Dr. Rosenhek became a Fellow of the Royal College. This entitled him to use the designation of "FRCP(C)". Effective December 1, 1986, Dr. Rosenhek was removed from the register of Fellows because of his failure to pay annual dues. As a result, he was not entitled to use the designation FRCP(C). He was not reinstated as a Fellow until November 5, 2008 when the dues were paid. From 1986 to 2008, Dr. Rosenhek routinely represented himself as a Fellow of the Royal College by using the designation FRCP(C) in his professional communications with hospital administration, patients, physician colleagues and the public.

Dr. Rosenhek held privileges at Hospital A in 2006 and was bound by the hospital's credentialing/re-appointment process, including a policy requiring department members applying for reappointment to either submit certificates demonstrating their compliance with the Royal College's Maintenance of Competence Program ("MOC program") or documentation of adequate attendance at a major Continuing Medical Education ("CME") event related to the specialists' field of practice. On Dr. Rosenhek's application for reappointment for 2007/2008, he indicated that he was a member of the Royal College and was fulfilling the requirement of the MOC program. He did not provide a certificate demonstrating his compliance with the program or any documentation of his CME for the relevant time period.

On July 13, 2007, the Chief of the Department of Medicine of Hospital A wrote to Dr. Rosenhek notifying him that his application was incomplete, as it failed to include proof his continuing medical education.

He asked that Dr. Rosenhek submit this information on or before July 31, 2007. Dr. Rosenhek did not provide any additional information to the hospital in connection with his application for re-appointment in 2007-2008.

Dr. Rosenhek submitted another application for re-appointment to the professional staff of Hospital A for the 2008-2009 year. He failed to check "yes" or "no" to the questions regarding whether he was a member of the Royal College and whether he was fulfilling the requirements of the MOC program. He also failed to provide a certificate demonstrating his compliance with the MOC program or provide proof of his CME. Dr. X wrote to Dr. Rosenhek on March 3 and June 3, 2008, to advise that his application was incomplete for these reasons and asked him to complete his application and submit it by June 17, 2008. On August 21 and 25, 2008, Dr. Rosenhek wrote to Dr. X providing certificates indicating he had attended CME programs.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that Dr. Rosenhek attend before the panel to be reprimanded and pay costs to the College in the amount of $15,000 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order.
 
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): August 6, 2013

Date of Decision: 08 Nov 2010
Summary of Decision:
On November 8, 2010, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Rosenhek committed acts of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession of cardiology between 2005 and 2007 in his care of multiple patients (including by failing to diagnose medical conditions appropriately and in a sufficiently timely manner, by failing to appropriately manage cardiac risk factors, by failing to appropriately monitor complications of medications, and other enumerated failures).

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. The Registrar suspend Dr. Rosenhek’s certificate of registration for a period of four (4) weeks commencing on December 6, 2010;

2. Dr. Rosenhek attend before the panel to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the register;

3. The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Rosenhek’s certificate of registration for an indefinite period of time:

a. Dr. Rosenhek shall practise solely in an office setting and shall not engage in any hospital-based practice. Dr. Rosenhek may bring a motion before a panel of the Discipline Committee to vary this condition, but not earlier than nine (9) months after the date of this Order;
b. At his own expense, Dr. Rosenhek shall engage in a program of continuing medical education in cardiology that fulfills all of the Maintenance of Certification requirements of the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons and shall maintain a record of such activities to be produced to the College upon request;
c. At his own expense, Dr. Rosenhek shall successfully complete, within approximately 18 months, the following education programs:
i. the College’s Medical Record-Keeping for Physicians course, including the follow-up component; and
ii. an education program in communications acceptable to the College, and shall provide proof to the College of his successful completion thereof.
d. Dr. Rosenhek shall practise only under the supervision of a clinical supervisor retained at his own expense and approved by the College, who has signed an undertaking in the form attached as Schedule A, and will abide at his own expense by all recommendations of his supervisor with respect to his practice, including with respect to any practice improvements and/or ongoing professional development and/or education;
e. If, at any time after 24 months have passed since the commencement of the clinical supervision of his practice set out at paragraph 4(d) above, Dr. Rosenhek’s clinical supervisor is of the opinion that Dr. Rosenhek is ready to practice without clinical supervision, such clinical supervision shall be discontinued only upon:
i. an assessment of Dr. Rosenhek’s practice, undertaken by a College-appointed assessor at Dr. Rosenhek’s expense, the results of which are satisfactory to the College; and
ii. the approval of the College.
f. In any 24-hour period, Dr. Rosenhek will see no more than the lower of (i) 30 patients, and (ii) the number of patients determined by his clinical supervisor.

4. Dr. Rosenhek shall within 30 days pay the College its costs of this proceeding in the amount of $10,000.00.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): November 8, 2010

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 11 Oct 2017
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Israel Shoel Rosenhek to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 11, 2017:

Dr. Rosenhek must not see more than a maximum of three patients per hour. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (3)

Date of Decision: 11 Oct 2017
Summary of Decision:
On October 11, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Rosenhek committed an act of professional misconduct in that has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all of the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as unprofessional by practicing medicine without clinical supervision, in breach a 2010 Order of the Discipline Committee and contrary to the terms, conditions, and limitations on his certificate of registration.

Dr. Rosenhek is a cardiologist with a practice in Toronto, Ontario. Prior to 2016, he also had a practice in Windsor, Ontario.

2010 Discipline Committee Order

On November 8, 2010, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Rosenhek had committed an act of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in cardiology between 2005 and 2007 in his care of multiple patients by:
a) failing to appropriately manage cardiac risk factors, such as dyslipidemia, and to prescribe appropriate therapy to reduce such risk;
b) failing to perform indicated investigations;
c) failing to diagnose medical conditions appropriately and in a sufficiently timely manner;
d) failing to appropriately monitor and/or ensure monitoring of complications of medications;
e) failing to monitor and act upon test results in an appropriate and sufficiently timely manner;
f) failing to engage in appropriate discharge planning for patients in the hospital, including failing to make appropriate and necessary arrangements for care and follow-up; and/or
g) failing to maintain legible and sufficiently detailed records of his care and treatment of patients.

The Discipline Committee ordered that the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Rosenhek’s certificate of registration for an indefinite period of time:

i) Dr. Rosenhek shall practise only under the supervision of a Clinical Supervisor retained at his own expense and approved by the College, and will abide at his own expense by all recommendations of his supervisor with respect to his practice, including with respect to any practice improvements and/or ongoing professional development and/or education;
ii) If, at any time after 24 months have passed since the commencement of the clinical supervision of his practice, Dr. Rosenhek’s clinical supervisor is of the opinion that Dr. Rosenhek is ready to practice without clinical supervision, such clinical supervision shall be discontinued only upon:
a. an assessment of Dr. Rosenhek’s practice, undertaken by a College-appointed assessor; and
b. at Dr. Rosenhek’s expense, the results of which are satisfactory to the College; and the approval of the College.

Terms of Clinical Supervision

As a result of the November 8, 2010 Discipline Committee Order, Dr. Rosenhek engaged a Clinical Supervisor, who undertook to act as Clinical Supervisor for Dr. Rosenhek, for the duration of at least 24 months. After 3 months of clinical supervision, the level of supervision could be varied at Clinical Supervisor’ discretion and with the approval of the College, provided that clinical supervision continued for at least 24 months in total. The Clinical Supervisor agreed to submit a written report to the College on a monthly basis for the duration of the clinical supervision.

The Clinical Supervisor further agreed that at any time after 24 months, if he is of the opinion that Dr. Rosenhek is ready to practise without clinical supervision, he shall advise the College of this so that the College may arrange for a practice reassessment to be conducted by an assessor of its choice. In such a case, the clinical supervision was not to terminate unless and until: (a) the College receives, evaluates, and is satisfied by the results of the practice reassessment; and (b) the College provides its approval for the termination of clinical supervision of Dr. Rosenhek’s practice.

Clinical Supervision and Breach of the 2010 Discipline Committee Order

The Clinical Supervisor provided the College with supervision reports during the period from January 14, 2011 to August 15, 2014.

On May 16, 2011, the Clinical Supervisor recommended that the number of patient charts reviewed per week be reduced from 10 to 5. The College agreed to this change on May 31, 2011. This was the only variation of the terms of Dr. Rosenhek’s clinical supervision for which permission was sought from the College, and the only variation approved by the College.

On December 8, 2011 and on June 20, 2012 the College advised the Clinical Supervisor that his reports did not contain enough information to determine whether Dr. Rosenhek was practising within the standard of practice, and requested that his future reports contain more fulsome information.

On September 6, 2012, the Clinical Supervisor reported that Dr. Rosenhek has made tremendous improvements in his practice and that he is at the point to practise without clinical supervision. The College responded on October 15, 2012, indicating that pursuant to the Discipline Committee Order, the 24-month period of clinical supervision is calculated from the time the supervision commences, and, therefore, the earliest date on which Dr. Rosenhek’s supervision could potentially end is on a date after November 2012.

On January 10 and April 11, 2013, respectively, the Clinical Supervisor reported that in his opinion the chart reviews could be eliminated and that he believes that it would be appropriate to end this ongoing review.

The College responded on June 13, 2013, indicating that pursuant to the Discipline Committee Order, the clinical supervision must continue until Dr. Rosenhek undergoes reassessment by the College and the discontinuation of the supervision is approved by the College following a review of the assessor’s report. The College informed the Clinical Supervisor that the review was being arranged and that it could take six months to complete, during which time he was to provide supervision of Dr. Rosenhek’s practice, until the College approves discontinuation of supervision.

The College was in correspondence with Dr. Rosenhek from July 2013 to March 2014 in an attempt to schedule practice reassessment. Dr. Rosenhek’s practice reassessment proceeded in March 2014.

On April 9, 2014 and on April 11, 2014, the Clinical Supervisor reported to the College that he has provided clinical supervision of Dr. Rosenhek’s practice since November 2010, and that it was his understanding that the supervision would last for 24 months, until November 2013. He indicated that he had no concerns with Dr. Rosenhek’s practice, that there is no further value in continuing to do reviews of Dr. Rosenhek’s records, and that he believes that he had completed his initial agreement with the College.

On April 9, 2014, the College wrote to the clinical supervisor, indicating that Dr. Rosenhek is expected to practise under supervision until his practice reassessment is completed, that Dr. Rosenhek is currently in the process of submitting the information required for the reassessment and to continue to provide supervision as per his undertaking until the reassessment is completed and the College communicates approval of its discontinuation. On July 30, 2014, the College wrote to the Clinical Supervisor to provide him with templates for his future reports and requesting that he completed and submitted the reports each month.

The Clinical Supervisor’s last supervision report dated July 16, 2014 was received by the College on August 15, 2014. On August 25, 2014, the College wrote to the Clinical Supervisor requesting him to submit the August 2014 report, but no response was received .

Following the College’s inquiry during the practice reassessment as to whether Dr. Rosenhek’s practice is still under the clinical supervision as per the 2010 Discipline Committee’s Order, Dr. Rosenhek’s counsel informed the College on October 8, 2015 that the Clinical Supervisor had not received the College’s letter of August 25, 2014 and that the Supervisor was of the understanding that no further reports were required of him, and that he advised Dr. Rosenhek that ongoing supervision was not required as he had fulfilled his undertaking. Dr. Rosenhek’s counsel further indicated that the Clinical Supervisor now recognizes that he wrongly interpreted his obligations under his undertaking and that he regrets his error.

On October 3, 2017, Dr. Rosenhek advised the College that following the College’s letter of September 15, 2015, he has sent copies of his patient charts to the Clinical Supervisor for the period from August 2014 to August 2015, and that he continued to periodically provide his records from September 2015 until approximately March 2016.

After July 2014, Dr. Rosenhek continued to practise medicine without supervision, in breach of the requirements in the 2010 Discipline Committee Order; he did not meet and did not follow-up with the Clinical Supervisor to determine if he was reviewing the patient charts that he resumed sending to the Supervisor after September 2015.

The College did not advise either the Clinical Supervisor or Dr. Rosenhek that supervision was no longer required. The College repeatedly advised the Clinical Supervisor that his clinical supervision of Dr. Rosenhek was to continue until he was advised by the College that it approved of the discontinuation of supervision. The College never approved the discontinuation of Dr. Rosenhek’s supervision. Dr. Rosenhek did not attempt to confirm with the College whether his apparent understanding, or the Clinical Supervisor’s apparent advice, that supervision was no longer required, were correct. Similarly, at no time did Dr. Rosenhek bring a motion to vary the terms of the 2010 Discipline Committee Order to permit him to return to unsupervised practice.

Prior Dispositions by the Complaints Committee

In November 2003, the Complaints Committee of the College required Dr. Rosenhek to attend at the College to be cautioned when aspects of his practice, and his response to a College complaint, were found to be concerning. Dr. Rosenhek was cautioned with regard to, among other things, the intemperate nature of his response to the patient complaint, the “threatening and intimidating tone” of which the Committee found to be “unnecessarily belligerent in the extreme”.

In June 2004, the Complaints Committee of the College required Dr. Rosenhek to attend at the College to be cautioned regarding his professional communications.

In October 2006, the Complaints Committee of the College cautioned Dr. Rosenhek regarding his communications with patients and the importance of maintaining a professional and courteous demeanour.

In December 2008, the Complaints Committee of the College required Dr. Rosenhek to attend at the College to be cautioned regarding his professional attitude and demeanour in interacting with a patient, and the importance of understanding the fundamental nature of positive and effective communications
with patients.

2013 Discipline Committee decision

On October 21, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Rosenhek had engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional for:
- falsely representing himself as a member of the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada and using the “FRCP(C)” designation when in fact he was not in good standing with the Royal College because of his failure to pay fees and his failure to report his continuing medical education hours pursuant to the Royal College’s Maintenance of Competence (“MOC”) program, between December 1986 when was removed from the register of Fellows in good standing with the Royal College because of his failure to pay annual dues and November 2008 when he paid his dues; and
- providing incomplete and inaccurate information to the Windsor Regional Hospital (where he held privileges) as part of its credentialing/re-appointment process regarding his compliance with a program of continuing medical education between 2006 and 2008.

As a result, Dr. Rosenhek was required to appear before the panel to be reprimanded, and to pay costs to the College.

March 23, 2016 Undertaking in lieu of s. 37 Order

On March 23, 2016 and on July 21, 2016 Dr. Rosenhek entered into interim undertakings with the College, which remained in effect until the date the Discipline Committee disposed of his discipline case.

Dr. Rosenhek undertook, among other things, to limit his practice to an initial maximum of the equivalent of two days per month, which limit was later raised to three days per month. He also agreed to practice under the supervision of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College, who was required to meet with Dr. Rosenhek once per month to review at least ten patient charts from the equivalent of each full day of patient care provided by Dr. Rosenhek, and to submit written reports to the College at least once every two months.

As a result of the interim undertakings, Dr. Rosenhek practised under the supervision of a different Clinical Supervisor, beginning March 23, 2016. In early 2017, the new Clinical Supervisor advised that he would be discontinuing his supervision of Dr. Rosenhek’s practice as of April 30, 2017. Dr. Rosenhek was not able to locate a replacement supervisor. Dr. Rosenhek has not practiced medicine since May 1, 2017.

No concerns regarding Dr. Rosenhek’s compliance with the interim undertakings have been identified by either the Clinical Supervisor or the College’s compliance monitor.

October 11, 2017 Undertaking

Dr. Rosenhek has entered into an undertaking with the College, dated October 11, 2017, by which he has agreed, among other things, that he shall see a maximum of three patients per hour.

On October 11, 2017, the Committee ordered and directed that:

- the Registrar suspend Dr. Rosenhek’s certificate of registration for a period of one (1) month commencing on October 12, 2017.
- Dr. Rosenhek appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
- Dr. Rosenhek pay costs to the College in the amount of $5,500.00 within 30 days of the date of this Order.
- the results of this proceeding be included in the register.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): October 11, 2017

Date of Decision: 06 Aug 2013
Summary of Decision:
On August 6, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Israel Shoel Rosenhek committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Rosenhek did not contest the allegation.

Dr. Rosenhek was certified as a specialist in cardiology and internal medicine by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada effective December 7, 1983 and June 12, 1984, respectively. He continues to hold these qualifications. In January 1984, Dr. Rosenhek became a Fellow of the Royal College. This entitled him to use the designation of "FRCP(C)". Effective December 1, 1986, Dr. Rosenhek was removed from the register of Fellows because of his failure to pay annual dues. As a result, he was not entitled to use the designation FRCP(C). He was not reinstated as a Fellow until November 5, 2008 when the dues were paid. From 1986 to 2008, Dr. Rosenhek routinely represented himself as a Fellow of the Royal College by using the designation FRCP(C) in his professional communications with hospital administration, patients, physician colleagues and the public.

Dr. Rosenhek held privileges at Hospital A in 2006 and was bound by the hospital's credentialing/re-appointment process, including a policy requiring department members applying for reappointment to either submit certificates demonstrating their compliance with the Royal College's Maintenance of Competence Program ("MOC program") or documentation of adequate attendance at a major Continuing Medical Education ("CME") event related to the specialists' field of practice. On Dr. Rosenhek's application for reappointment for 2007/2008, he indicated that he was a member of the Royal College and was fulfilling the requirement of the MOC program. He did not provide a certificate demonstrating his compliance with the program or any documentation of his CME for the relevant time period.

On July 13, 2007, the Chief of the Department of Medicine of Hospital A wrote to Dr. Rosenhek notifying him that his application was incomplete, as it failed to include proof his continuing medical education.

He asked that Dr. Rosenhek submit this information on or before July 31, 2007. Dr. Rosenhek did not provide any additional information to the hospital in connection with his application for re-appointment in 2007-2008.

Dr. Rosenhek submitted another application for re-appointment to the professional staff of Hospital A for the 2008-2009 year. He failed to check "yes" or "no" to the questions regarding whether he was a member of the Royal College and whether he was fulfilling the requirements of the MOC program. He also failed to provide a certificate demonstrating his compliance with the MOC program or provide proof of his CME. Dr. X wrote to Dr. Rosenhek on March 3 and June 3, 2008, to advise that his application was incomplete for these reasons and asked him to complete his application and submit it by June 17, 2008. On August 21 and 25, 2008, Dr. Rosenhek wrote to Dr. X providing certificates indicating he had attended CME programs.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that Dr. Rosenhek attend before the panel to be reprimanded and pay costs to the College in the amount of $15,000 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order.
 
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): August 6, 2013

Date of Decision: 08 Nov 2010
Summary of Decision:
On November 8, 2010, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Rosenhek committed acts of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession of cardiology between 2005 and 2007 in his care of multiple patients (including by failing to diagnose medical conditions appropriately and in a sufficiently timely manner, by failing to appropriately manage cardiac risk factors, by failing to appropriately monitor complications of medications, and other enumerated failures).

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. The Registrar suspend Dr. Rosenhek’s certificate of registration for a period of four (4) weeks commencing on December 6, 2010;

2. Dr. Rosenhek attend before the panel to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the register;

3. The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Rosenhek’s certificate of registration for an indefinite period of time:

a. Dr. Rosenhek shall practise solely in an office setting and shall not engage in any hospital-based practice. Dr. Rosenhek may bring a motion before a panel of the Discipline Committee to vary this condition, but not earlier than nine (9) months after the date of this Order;
b. At his own expense, Dr. Rosenhek shall engage in a program of continuing medical education in cardiology that fulfills all of the Maintenance of Certification requirements of the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons and shall maintain a record of such activities to be produced to the College upon request;
c. At his own expense, Dr. Rosenhek shall successfully complete, within approximately 18 months, the following education programs:
i. the College’s Medical Record-Keeping for Physicians course, including the follow-up component; and
ii. an education program in communications acceptable to the College, and shall provide proof to the College of his successful completion thereof.
d. Dr. Rosenhek shall practise only under the supervision of a clinical supervisor retained at his own expense and approved by the College, who has signed an undertaking in the form attached as Schedule A, and will abide at his own expense by all recommendations of his supervisor with respect to his practice, including with respect to any practice improvements and/or ongoing professional development and/or education;
e. If, at any time after 24 months have passed since the commencement of the clinical supervision of his practice set out at paragraph 4(d) above, Dr. Rosenhek’s clinical supervisor is of the opinion that Dr. Rosenhek is ready to practice without clinical supervision, such clinical supervision shall be discontinued only upon:
i. an assessment of Dr. Rosenhek’s practice, undertaken by a College-appointed assessor at Dr. Rosenhek’s expense, the results of which are satisfactory to the College; and
ii. the approval of the College.
f. In any 24-hour period, Dr. Rosenhek will see no more than the lower of (i) 30 patients, and (ii) the number of patients determined by his clinical supervisor.

4. Dr. Rosenhek shall within 30 days pay the College its costs of this proceeding in the amount of $10,000.00.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): November 8, 2010

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 11 Oct 2017
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Israel Shoel Rosenhek to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 11, 2017:

Dr. Rosenhek must not see more than a maximum of three patients per hour. 

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 12 Nov 2017
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 12 Oct 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 11 Oct 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 06 May 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 21 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 23 Mar 2016
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 03 Jan 2011
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 06 Dec 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee. Effective: 08 Nov 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1981
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 12 Nov 2017

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Oct 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 11 Oct 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 06 May 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 23 Mar 2016

DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 03 Jan 2011

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Dec 2010

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 Nov 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 1984

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 1983

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1981

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1980