THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:51:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 21 Nov 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Records Management Ltd: 13 - 1 High Meadow Place, Toronto, Ontario
M9L 0A3
Date Received: 15 Jan 2020

Instructions/Address:
Patients may send medical record requests to Records Management Ltd:

13 - 1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3

Tel: 1-800-775-0093
Date Received: 26 Sep 2019

Instructions/Address: Medical records storage facility: Records management Ltd.
Paitents looking to obtain copies of their medical charts should contact toll free:
1-800-775-0093

www.recordsregistry.ca

or

13 - 1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 04 Jul 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Clifford Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Jan 2020

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 21 Nov 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Records Management Ltd: 13 - 1 High Meadow Place, Toronto, Ontario
M9L 0A3
Date Received: 15 Jan 2020

Instructions/Address:
Patients may send medical record requests to Records Management Ltd:

13 - 1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3

Tel: 1-800-775-0093
Date Received: 26 Sep 2019

Instructions/Address: Medical records storage facility: Records management Ltd.
Paitents looking to obtain copies of their medical charts should contact toll free:
1-800-775-0093

www.recordsregistry.ca

or

13 - 1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 04 Jul 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Clifford Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Jan 2020

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 15 Jan 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1983
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2020


DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 1983