THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:24:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1981
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University Medical Centre
Room 3V-49
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 76374
Fax: (905) 521-4971
Address: St Josephs Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 521-6000
Fax: (905) 521-4971

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology
Effective: 30 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University Medical Centre
Room 3V-49
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 76374
Fax: (905) 521-4971
Address: St Josephs Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 521-6000
Fax: (905) 521-4971

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology
Effective: 30 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN WASERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WASERMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN WASERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WASERMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1983
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 1983