THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:54:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of London, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 04 Dec 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: University of London, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 04 Dec 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of London, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 05 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 1984
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jan 1995

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jan 1984