THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:16:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1976
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Hematological Pathology
Effective: 01 Dec 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Hematological Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Arinola Adesanya Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 Jul 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Hematological Pathology
Effective: 01 Dec 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Hematological Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Arinola Adesanya Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 Jul 2023

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 1984
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 1987

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Aug 1987

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1985

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Mar 1984