THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:40:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Utkal University, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE, HAKKA, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. H. Yu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 May 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE, HAKKA, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: Utkal University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. H. Yu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 May 2023

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 24 Nov 2017
Summary of Decision:
On November 24, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Tsai Hsing Yu committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional.
 
Dr. Yu is a family physician who graduated from medical school at Utkal University in India in 1976. He obtained a certificate of registration authorizing independent practice from the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”) on April 4, 1984. Dr. Yu carries on a family and walk-in practice in St. Catharines, Ontario.
 
2016 Undertaking
 
On July 27, 2016, as a result of a College investigation, Dr. Yu entered into an Undertaking with the College. Pursuant to the 2016 Undertaking, Dr. Yu agreed not to issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for any narcotics, controlled or monitored drugs, or benzodiazepines or other targeted substances, with the exception of certain specified drugs which he is permitted to prescribe where clinically indicated.
 
Breach of the 2016 Undertaking
 
Between September and November 2016, inclusive, Dr. Yu renewed prescriptions for controlled substances for three patients on three occasions:
 
?In October 2016, Dr. Yu renewed a prescription for Sublinox for Patient A;
?In September 2016, Dr. Yu renewed a prescription for Lorazepam for Patient B; and
?In November 2016, Dr. Yu renewed a prescription for Lorazepam for Patient C.
 
Lorazepam and Sublinox (also known as zolpidem tartrate) are Class 1 Targeted Substances listed in the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act. These substances are not among the specified drugs Dr.Yu is permitted to prescribe pursuant to his 2016 Undertaking. By authorizing these prescription renewals, Dr. Yu breached his 2016 Undertaking with the College.
 
Penalty
 
The following facts about Dr. Yu’s history with the College were presented during the penalty portion of the hearing:
 
In 1994, as a result of a College investigation, Dr. Yu agreed to relinquish his prescribing privileges with respect to narcotics and controlled drugs pursuant to the provisions of the legislation in place at that time. A letter requesting voluntary termination of these privileges was sent to Health Canada early in 1995.
 
In 2009, Dr. Yu requested an amendment to his prescribing restriction. On February 11, 2011, Dr. Yu signed an undertaking with the College which modified his prescribing restriction (“2011 Undertaking”). Pursuant to the 2011 Undertaking, Dr. Yu continued to be prohibited
 
- 2 -
 
from prescribing narcotics and other targeted substances, but he was permitted to prescribe stimulants for the treatment of ADHD, long-acting narcotics for terminal patients, and Androgenic Steroid Replacement. 
 
In December 2015, after receiving information regarding Dr. Yu’s prescribing, the College commenced an investigation. In April 2016, a College investigator requested that Dr. Yu respond to the concern that he appeared to have breached his 2011 Undertaking by prescribing short-acting narcotics for patients who did not have a terminal diagnosis. In May 2016, Dr. Yu confirmed that he had prescribed short-acting narcotics to four patients who did not have a terminal diagnosis, contrary to the terms of his 2011 undertaking. Dr. Yu indicated that he would consider entering into a new undertaking whereby he would not prescribe any narcotics or controlled drugs.
 
In July 2016, the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College (“ICRC”) deferred the matter to permit negotiation of an undertaking with Dr. Yu, which he signed on July 27, 2016. On November 18, 2016, upon considering the results of the investigation, the ICRC decided to accept Dr. Yu’s 2016 Undertaking. The ICRC also required Dr. Yu to attend the College to be cautioned in person regarding his failure to comply with his practice restrictions by breaching the 2011 Undertaking.
 
Disposition
 
On November 24, 2017, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed on the matter of penalty and costs that:
- The Registrar suspend Dr. Yu’s certificate of registration for a three month period, to - commence at 12:01 a.m. on December 1, 2017.
- Dr. Yu appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
- Dr. Yu pay costs to the College in the amount of $5,500.00 within thirty (30) days of the date this Order.
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): November 24, 2017

Other Notifications (5)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 01 Nov 2017
Summary:
Effective June 4, 2020, Dr. Yu has completed this SCERP.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 01 Nov 2017
Summary:
Effective June 4, 2020 Dr. Yu has completed this SCERP.

Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 18 Nov 2016
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 18 Nov 2016
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:


Source: Member
Effective Date: 27 Jul 2016
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Tsai Hsing Yu to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective July 27, 2016:

Dr. Yu was the subject of a College investigation into his prescribing. As a result of the investigation Dr. Yu must not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for any of the following substances:

(i) Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(ii) Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27);

(iv) Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(v) All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);

and as amended from time to time, with the exception of the following substances which he is permitted to prescribe where clinically indicated:

(vi) Androderm, Axiron, Andrio, Testim, Testosterone, Dexedrine, Adderall XR, Biphentin, Concerta, Ritalin, Strattera, and Vyvanse.

Dr. Yu must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all his Practice Locations, which states as follows:

IMPORTANT NOTICE

Dr. Yu must not prescribe any of the following:
- Narcotic Drugs
- Narcotic Preparations
- Controlled Drugs
- Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
- All other Monitored Drugs

With the exception of the following, which Dr. Yu is permitted to prescribe where clinically indicated:

Androderm, Axiron, Andrio, Testim, Testosterone, Dexedrine, Adderall XR, Biphentin, Concerta, Ritalin, Strattera, and Vyvanse.

Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 24 Nov 2017
Summary of Decision:
On November 24, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Tsai Hsing Yu committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional.
 
Dr. Yu is a family physician who graduated from medical school at Utkal University in India in 1976. He obtained a certificate of registration authorizing independent practice from the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”) on April 4, 1984. Dr. Yu carries on a family and walk-in practice in St. Catharines, Ontario.
 
2016 Undertaking
 
On July 27, 2016, as a result of a College investigation, Dr. Yu entered into an Undertaking with the College. Pursuant to the 2016 Undertaking, Dr. Yu agreed not to issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for any narcotics, controlled or monitored drugs, or benzodiazepines or other targeted substances, with the exception of certain specified drugs which he is permitted to prescribe where clinically indicated.
 
Breach of the 2016 Undertaking
 
Between September and November 2016, inclusive, Dr. Yu renewed prescriptions for controlled substances for three patients on three occasions:
 
?In October 2016, Dr. Yu renewed a prescription for Sublinox for Patient A;
?In September 2016, Dr. Yu renewed a prescription for Lorazepam for Patient B; and
?In November 2016, Dr. Yu renewed a prescription for Lorazepam for Patient C.
 
Lorazepam and Sublinox (also known as zolpidem tartrate) are Class 1 Targeted Substances listed in the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act. These substances are not among the specified drugs Dr.Yu is permitted to prescribe pursuant to his 2016 Undertaking. By authorizing these prescription renewals, Dr. Yu breached his 2016 Undertaking with the College.
 
Penalty
 
The following facts about Dr. Yu’s history with the College were presented during the penalty portion of the hearing:
 
In 1994, as a result of a College investigation, Dr. Yu agreed to relinquish his prescribing privileges with respect to narcotics and controlled drugs pursuant to the provisions of the legislation in place at that time. A letter requesting voluntary termination of these privileges was sent to Health Canada early in 1995.
 
In 2009, Dr. Yu requested an amendment to his prescribing restriction. On February 11, 2011, Dr. Yu signed an undertaking with the College which modified his prescribing restriction (“2011 Undertaking”). Pursuant to the 2011 Undertaking, Dr. Yu continued to be prohibited
 
- 2 -
 
from prescribing narcotics and other targeted substances, but he was permitted to prescribe stimulants for the treatment of ADHD, long-acting narcotics for terminal patients, and Androgenic Steroid Replacement. 
 
In December 2015, after receiving information regarding Dr. Yu’s prescribing, the College commenced an investigation. In April 2016, a College investigator requested that Dr. Yu respond to the concern that he appeared to have breached his 2011 Undertaking by prescribing short-acting narcotics for patients who did not have a terminal diagnosis. In May 2016, Dr. Yu confirmed that he had prescribed short-acting narcotics to four patients who did not have a terminal diagnosis, contrary to the terms of his 2011 undertaking. Dr. Yu indicated that he would consider entering into a new undertaking whereby he would not prescribe any narcotics or controlled drugs.
 
In July 2016, the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College (“ICRC”) deferred the matter to permit negotiation of an undertaking with Dr. Yu, which he signed on July 27, 2016. On November 18, 2016, upon considering the results of the investigation, the ICRC decided to accept Dr. Yu’s 2016 Undertaking. The ICRC also required Dr. Yu to attend the College to be cautioned in person regarding his failure to comply with his practice restrictions by breaching the 2011 Undertaking.
 
Disposition
 
On November 24, 2017, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed on the matter of penalty and costs that:
- The Registrar suspend Dr. Yu’s certificate of registration for a three month period, to - commence at 12:01 a.m. on December 1, 2017.
- Dr. Yu appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
- Dr. Yu pay costs to the College in the amount of $5,500.00 within thirty (30) days of the date this Order.
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): November 24, 2017

Other Notifications (5)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 01 Nov 2017
Summary:
Effective June 4, 2020, Dr. Yu has completed this SCERP.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 01 Nov 2017
Summary:
Effective June 4, 2020 Dr. Yu has completed this SCERP.

Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 18 Nov 2016
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 18 Nov 2016
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:


Source: Member
Effective Date: 27 Jul 2016
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Tsai Hsing Yu to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective July 27, 2016:

Dr. Yu was the subject of a College investigation into his prescribing. As a result of the investigation Dr. Yu must not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for any of the following substances:

(i) Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(ii) Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27);

(iv) Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(v) All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);

and as amended from time to time, with the exception of the following substances which he is permitted to prescribe where clinically indicated:

(vi) Androderm, Axiron, Andrio, Testim, Testosterone, Dexedrine, Adderall XR, Biphentin, Concerta, Ritalin, Strattera, and Vyvanse.

Dr. Yu must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all his Practice Locations, which states as follows:

IMPORTANT NOTICE

Dr. Yu must not prescribe any of the following:
- Narcotic Drugs
- Narcotic Preparations
- Controlled Drugs
- Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
- All other Monitored Drugs

With the exception of the following, which Dr. Yu is permitted to prescribe where clinically indicated:

Androderm, Axiron, Andrio, Testim, Testosterone, Dexedrine, Adderall XR, Biphentin, Concerta, Ritalin, Strattera, and Vyvanse.

Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca

Training

Medical School: Utkal University, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 25 Mar 2024
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 12 Jan 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 04 Sep 2020
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 01 Mar 2018
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Dec 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 27 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 1984
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 25 Mar 2024

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2018

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Apr 1984