THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:31:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Natal, 1975
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Pathology
Effective: 01 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kumalo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Dec 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS
Medical School: University of Natal, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Pathology
Effective: 01 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kumalo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Dec 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Natal, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 09 Aug 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1984