THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:06:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1600 West Bank Dr
Trent University
Peterborough ON K9L 0G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7057481011
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 466 George St N
Peterborough ON K9H 3R7
Phone: 7057486711
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert J. King Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Mar 2019

Corporation Name: Robert King Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Apr 2007

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1600 West Bank Dr
Trent University
Peterborough ON K9L 0G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7057481011
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 466 George St N
Peterborough ON K9H 3R7
Phone: 7057486711
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert J. King Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Mar 2019

Corporation Name: Robert King Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Apr 2007

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT JOSEPH KING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KING is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT JOSEPH KING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KING is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Apr 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 15 Apr 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Apr 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1984