THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:49:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Far Eastern University, 1977
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FILIPINO, TAGALOG

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1920 Ellesmere Rd
Suite 110
Scarborough Ontario M1H 2V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 269-5144
Fax: (416) 269-5809

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jan 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 11 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Meneses Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Sep 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FILIPINO, TAGALOG
Medical School: Far Eastern University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1920 Ellesmere Rd
Suite 110
Scarborough Ontario M1H 2V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 269-5144
Fax: (416) 269-5809

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jan 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 11 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Meneses Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Sep 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GLORIA SORIANO MENESES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENESES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GLORIA SORIANO MENESES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENESES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Far Eastern University, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1984